MD SB258 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB148
Note: Carry Over of previous SB349
Note: Carry Over of previous SB349
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding eligibility for a property tax exemption for the dwelling house of a disabled veteran to include veterans with a service connected disability of at least 80%; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB258 (Carry Over) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
SB349 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
HB591 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
SB349 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
HB591 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 7 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0258?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0258f.pdf |