MD SB260 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the eligibility requirements for a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship; altering the employment requirements relating to a service obligation associated with a scholarship; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission's annual report to the General Assembly to include data on the number of scholarship recipients who received a baccalaureate degree from a 4-year institution in the State and the number of scholarships for which the service obligation was deferred, waived, or converted into a student loan; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 752
2019-04-04SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2019-04-04SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {274664/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {124131/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0260?ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0260f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0260t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0260e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_752_sb0260e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0260_12413101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0260_27466401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0260.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0260_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0416.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0260_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1131.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1166.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback