MD SB268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering an exception to the requirement that a police officer charge certain offenses by citation; and expanding the list of charges to which a certain prohibition against violating a certain condition of pretrial or posttrial release is applicable to include stalking.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Violation of Conditions of Release
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Citations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Sexual Offenses
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Sexual Offenses