MD SB269 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB573
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from 55 years old to 50 years old, the age at which a resident is eligible for a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for retirement income attributable to certain employment; altering the amount of certain retirement income that may be included under a certain subtraction modification; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB269 (Carry Over) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
HB350 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
HB350 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Correctional Officers
Emergency Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Correctional Officers
Emergency Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Rescue Squads
Retirement
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0269?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0269f.pdf |