MD SB27 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting the acquisition of certain fine art or decorative art by the State Archives from certain provisions of State procurement law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Archives – Acquisition of Fine Art or Decorative Art – Procurement Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-6) (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (134-6)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {216184/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-01-24SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-01-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-01-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-01-21SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-07SenateHearing 1/10 at 2:30 p.m.
2019-01-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-07SenateHearing 1/10 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-09-26SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback