MD SB270 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, in a prosecution for certain sexual offenses, evidence that the defendant committed sexually assaultive behavior before or after the offense for which the defendant is on trial may be admissible for certain reasons; requiring that the State file a motion of intent to introduce evidence of certain sexually assaultive behavior at least 90 days before the trial or at a later time under certain circumstances; requiring the State to provide a copy of a certain motion to the defendant; etc.
Title
Courts – Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {122814/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {198470/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Evidence
Hearings
Sexual Offenses
Trials
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Evidence
Hearings
Sexual Offenses
Trials