MD SB272 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Kelley)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain provision of law to require the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to require an individual to pass a polygraph examination or extensive background check, or both, rather than just a polygraph examination, before being appointed to serve as a correctional officer in a correctional facility; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Correctional Facilities - Correctional Officers - Background Check

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateRecommitted to Finance (Senator Kelley)
2019-03-11SenateFloor Amendment {553329/1 (Senator Peters)
2019-03-08SenateLaid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateSubstitute Floor Amendment {553329/1 (Senator Peters)
2019-03-08SenateFloor Amendment {233420/1 (Senator Carozza) Withdrawn
2019-03-07SenateSpecial Order until 3/8 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
2019-03-07SenateFloor Amendment {233420/1 (Senator Carozza)
2019-03-06SenateSpecial Order until 3/7 (Senator Peters) Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFloor Amendment {233420/1 (Senator Carozza)
2019-03-06SenateMotion Returned Second Reading (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-02-28SenateSpecial Order until 3/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-02-26SenateSpecial Order until 2/27 (Senator Carter) Adopted
2019-02-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-21SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback