MD SB275 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing in Frederick County a certain requirement for a promoter's permit, so that an event that a for-profit organization seeks to publicize, sell tickets for, organize, produce, or stage need not be conducted in conjunction with a nonprofit organization that holds a certain license; and providing permit fees of $50 if fewer than 500 people are expected to attend, $250 if 500 to 1,000 people will attend, $600 if 1,001 to 3,000 persons are expected to attend, and $1,000 for over 3,000 attendees.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {814635/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses