MD SB277 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB132
Note: Carry Over of previous SB303
Note: Carry Over of previous SB303
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of a certain credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by a public safety officer; repealing a certain limitation on the amount of the credit; requiring the governing body of a county or municipal corporation that authorizes the credit to establish, by law, the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of eligibility for the credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition and Limitation on Credit Amount
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB277 (Carry Over) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
SB303 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
SB303 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Correctional Officers
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residential Property
Sheriffs
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residential Property
Sheriffs
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0277?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0277f.pdf |