MD SB279 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Aging to make grants to nonprofit organizations and area agencies on aging to expand and establish certain aging-in-place programs for seniors; requiring the Department to publicize the availability of grant opportunities to eligible organizations at least 6 weeks before the applications are due; establishing a requirement for an equal match for the funds requested by a nonprofit organization or an area agency on aging in order for the nonprofit organization to receive a State grant; etc.
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA")
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {537972/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Aging, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Governor
Grants
Home Care Services
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Aging, Department of
Appropriations
Budgets
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Governor
Grants
Home Care Services
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Social Services