MD SB28 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "health benefit plan" as it applies to certain provisions of law related to coverage requirements for the diagnosis and treatment of mental illness and emotional, drug use, and alcohol use disorders to include short-term limited duration health insurance.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage Requirements for Behavioral Health Disorders - Short-Term Limited Duration Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |