MD SB280 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an electric company from disclosing specified data to a third party, subject to specified exceptions; authorizing a customer to submit a specified complaint to the Public Service Commission under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to conduct a specified investigation following receipt of a complaint; authorizing the Commission to take specified actions; making an electric company liable for unauthorized disclosures of specified information; etc.
Title
Electricity - Smart Meters - Disclosure of Usage Data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fines
Investigations and Inquiries
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Disclosure
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fines
Investigations and Inquiries
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation