MD SB280 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying the State minimum wage rate that is in effect for certain time periods and for certain employers except under certain circumstances; authorizing the Board of Public Works to temporarily suspend an increase to the minimum wage rate if the seasonally adjusted total employment is negative, subject to certain limitations; requiring the Governor's proposed budget for certain fiscal years to include certain rate increases for certain community service providers over the funding provided in certain legislative appropriations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Overridden (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor - Overridden (95-43) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Conference Committee Report {793622/1 Adopted (32-13) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-43) (Y: 95 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {143220/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-29) (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {803524/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {803929/1 (Senator Hester) Rejected (18-27) (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted (96-41) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-44) (Y: 94 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
2019-03-28HouseVeto overridden (95-43)
2019-03-28SenateVeto overridden (32-15)
2019-03-27SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2019-03-21SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed (94-43)
2019-03-21HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (32-13)
2019-03-20SenateConference Committee Report Adopted (32-13)
2019-03-18HouseDelegates D.E. Davis, Wilson, and Dumais
2019-03-18HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-03-18HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-03-18SenateSenators Kelley, Feldman, and Augustine
2019-03-18SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-03-18SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-03-18SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (93-44)
2019-03-15HouseMotion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted (96-41)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {393297/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (32-15)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {803929/1 (Senator Hester) Rejected (18-27)
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {563824/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {603926/2 (Senator Young) Rejected
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {803524/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
2019-03-13SenateFloor Amendment {143220/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-29)
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {577171/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-12SenateSpecial Order until 3/13 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {577171/1
2019-03-11SenateLaid Over (Senator Miller) Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {577171/1
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects

Administrative Agencies
Age of Majority
Appropriations
Attorneys' Fees
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Budgets
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Community Facilities and Services
Consumer Price Index
Contracts
Credit
Data
Developmental Disabilities
Discrimination
District of Columbia
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Governor
Gratuities
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Home Care Services
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor and Industry, Division of
Licenses
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Nursing Homes
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Works, Board of
Railroads
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Small Business
State Government - Personnel
Time
Work, Labor and Employment

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0280&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0280f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0280t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0280e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_11_sb0280e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_57717101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_14322001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_56382401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_60392602.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_80352401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_80392901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_39329701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_58382701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_79362201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0280.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0280_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0489.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0490.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0491.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0280_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0552.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0538.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0539.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0280_79362201.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0700.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0701.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0886.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/veto_letters/sb0280.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0980.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0831.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback