MD SB280 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 177
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application requirements for a service member, veteran, or military spouse to apply for an occupational or professional license from a unit in the Maryland Department of Labor to require submission of proof that the applicant has held a certain license from another state for at least 1 year; authorizing the issuance of a temporary license to certain individuals who have held a valid license from another state for less than 1 year provided that the license is in good standing; etc.
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Revisions to Reciprocity Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 177 |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (129-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {284634/1 Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB349 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 176
Subjects
Armed Forces
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Identification
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Spouses
Time
Veterans
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Identification
Labor, Department of
Licenses
Spouses
Time
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 5 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 5 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |