MD SB282 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Motor Vehicle Administration from basing a suspension or revocation of the registration of a vehicle on the vehicle owner's failure to have the vehicle inspected and tested as required under the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2019-02-13SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-30SenateHearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback