MD SB283 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the sales and use tax the cleaning of a commercial or industrial building if the building is owned by a common ownership community or retirement community and used for certain purposes; providing that the exemption does not apply to a building or a proportionate share of a building if the building or proportionate share of the building is used for a purpose that requires the collection of the sales and use tax; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Cleaning of Commercial or Industrial Buildings - Community Property Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Elderly Persons
Emergency Bills
Food
Industry and Technology
Sales and Use Tax
Sports and Recreation
Storage
Taxes - Sales and Use
Community Facilities and Services
Education
Elderly Persons
Emergency Bills
Food
Industry and Technology
Sales and Use Tax
Sports and Recreation
Storage
Taxes - Sales and Use