MD SB284 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Declaring that the General Assembly finds that 9-1-1 specialists are key members of the team of public safety personnel; repealing references to the term "9-1-1 public safety telecommunicator" and substituting references to the term "9-1-1 specialist" in certain provisions authorizing a certain property tax credit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 300
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-27HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {597171/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback