MD SB285 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Physicians, in cooperation with the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners, the State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice, the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners, and other stakeholders, to study the practice of kinesiotherapy, study national standards, and make recommendations regarding the licensure and regulation of kinesiotherapy in the State and report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before specified dates; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Kinesiotherapy - Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn |
2013-03-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {184531/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |