MD SB285 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a landowner whose land is subject to an agricultural land preservation easement from granting, or allowing a person to establish, an overlay easement, a right-of-way, or any other servitude on the land without prior written permission of the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation; and authorizing the Foundation to approve an overlay easement, a right-of-way, or any other servitude on land subject to an agricultural land preservation easement under specified circumstances.
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Overlay Easements, Rights-of-Way, or Servitudes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |