MD SB285 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to study emerging communications technologies and develop a strategy for implementation of Next Generation 9-1-1 services across the State; authorizing the Emergency Number Systems Board to contract with a third-party contractor to provide staff for the Commission; requiring the Commission to report its final findings and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {683127/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {907273/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Contracts
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Fees
Frederick County
Grants
Procurement
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Contractors
Contracts
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Fees
Frederick County
Grants
Procurement
Public Safety
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology