MD SB285 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling in the State an expanded polystyrene food service product on or after July 1, 2020; prohibiting food service businesses and schools from selling or providing food or beverages in expanded polystyrene food service products on or after July 1, 2020; confirming the authority of certain local government entities to establish standards that are at least as stringent as those in the Act; requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a public education and outreach antilittering campaign; etc.
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-34) (Y: 99 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {153329/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (15-32) (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {563229/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {253522/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {493526/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29) (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {843126/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-34) (Y: 99 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {153329/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (15-32) (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {563229/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {253522/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {493526/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29) (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {843126/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-13) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-34) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {980511/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Special Order until 03/05 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {843126/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {493526/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {253522/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {563229/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {153329/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (15-32) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {903723/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Floor Amendment {903723/1 (Senator Kagan) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {614637/1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commerce and Business
Communications
Counties
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fines
Food
Health
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
internet
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Municipal Corporations
News Media
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Theaters
Transient Merchants
Commerce and Business
Communications
Counties
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Fines
Food
Health
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
internet
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Municipal Corporations
News Media
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Theaters
Transient Merchants