MD SB286 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain requirement that the Department of Legislative Services publish and index the titles of municipal charter amendments and local laws of charter and code counties in the Session Laws of the General Assembly; making certain conforming changes; and requiring the Department to publish the titles or the full text of municipal charter amendments and local laws of charter and code counties on the General Assembly website.
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Publication of Municipal Charter Amendments and Local Laws of Charter and Code Counties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Counties
Electronic Government
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Local Laws
Publications
State Government - General Assembly
Electronic Government
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Local Laws
Publications
State Government - General Assembly