MD SB290 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "cottage food product" to include nonhazardous food, as specified in certain Department of Health regulations, that is sold in the State in accordance with certain provisions of law and regulations directly to a consumer or to retail food stores or food cooperatives; requiring cottage food products for sale at a retail food store to include a certain label with certain information; requiring a business owner to submit certain information to the Department before selling a cottage food product; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-02HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-01HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-04-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {677376/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-29SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback