MD SB292 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "public safety officer" to include certain volunteer emergency medical technicians for purposes of a certain property tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-02-21SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-19SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-19SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-18SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-29SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback