MD SB294 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain for-profit institutions of higher education and private career schools from enrolling new Maryland residents if, beginning in fiscal year 2023, federal funds exceed 10% of annual revenues; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to adopt certain regulations by December 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Annual Revenues of For-Profit Institutions - Limitation on Enrollment (Veterans' Education Protection Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate P. Young) Adopted (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate P. Young) Adopted (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 546 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate P. Young) Adopted (127-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {884934/1 Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB593 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Fees
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Insurance
internet
Loans
Private Schools
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Tuition
Veterans
Contracts
Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Fees
Grants
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Insurance
internet
Loans
Private Schools
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Tuition
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 10 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 202.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |