MD SB299 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the exemption authorizing a parent or legal guardian of certain minors to provide certain written consent for the minor to use a tanning device; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to make available to each tanning facility a notice to be conspicuously posted in the facility regarding use of the facility by minors, penalties for violations of the Act, and health risks associated with tanning; providing that the Act does not apply to the use of phototherapy devices by certain health care practitioners; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tanning Devices - Use by Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-38) (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (28-19) (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (100-38)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (28-19)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {957176/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-12SenateLaid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {957176/1
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback