MD SB303 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an applicant to have graduated from at least a master's level program in acupuncture, or its equivalent, approved by certain entities to qualify for a license to practice acupuncture; altering the authority of the State Acupuncture Board to find certain programs to be equivalent to certain courses for licensure requirements; providing that certain provisions of the Act may be construed to apply only prospectively; etc.
Title
State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-15) (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-15) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {533229/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {614032/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment {614032/1 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {614032/1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |