MD SB304 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Delaying the effective date of the Maryland Healthy Working Families Act until July 1, 2018.
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Delay of Effective Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-17) (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Committee Amendment Adopted (28-15) (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (28-16) (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Committee Amendment Adopted (28-15) (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (28-16) (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (29-17) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted (28-16) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment {517171/1 Adopted (28-15) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Manno) Adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {517171/1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Emergency Bills
Labor and Industry, Division of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Labor and Industry, Division of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Time
Work, Labor and Employment