MD SB305 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 547
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 547
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Crisis Intervention Team Center of Excellence in the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide technical support to local governments, law enforcement, public safety agencies, behavioral health agencies, and crisis service providers and to develop and implement a crisis intervention model program; requiring the Office to appoint certain coordinators to the Center; requiring the Center to take certain actions; requiring a certain annual report; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Crisis Intervention Team Center of Excellence
Sponsors
Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 547 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-3) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {528774/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB607 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Education
Emergency Medical Services
Grants
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Safety
Reports
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Education
Emergency Medical Services
Grants
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Safety
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 522 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |