MD SB306 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a participating employer to submit supporting payroll data to the State Retirement Agency regarding a member's contributions at the time contributions are paid to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System; and providing, for violations of the Act, a 10% penalty of the member contribution due, 10% a year interest on delinquent member contributions until paid, a $250 penalty for each payroll for which supporting data is not submitted, and 10% a year interest on a certain penalty assessed under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-25HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {869632/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/14 at 9:00 a.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback