MD SB309 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the privileges of a racetrack license in Anne Arundel County; specifying certain attributes of a licensed racing establishment; specifying the location where beer, wine, and liquor may be sold under the license; specifying that the playing of music and dancing may occur on the licensed premises; allowing the carrying and consuming of beer, wine, and liquor anywhere on the licensed premises; authorizing the issuance of a racetrack concessionaire license; establishing an annual license fee of $5,000; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {184436/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Blue Laws
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Racing
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Blue Laws
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Racing
Time