MD SB309 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a pilot program to examine the testing of oral fluid samples by certain police officers to assist in determining whether an individual is operating a motor vehicle while impaired by a controlled dangerous substance; authorizing a police officer in a participating jurisdiction who has reasonable grounds to believe that an individual is or has been driving or attempting to drive a motor vehicle while impaired by a controlled dangerous substance to request the individual to provide an oral fluid sample; etc.
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsors
Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-3) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {798175/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB808 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Civil Actions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Equipment
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Reports
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Civil Actions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Equipment
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Reports
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 16 | 205.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 205.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |