MD SB310 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring Baltimore City, for the 2020 general election, to have eight early voting centers; and requiring one of the early voting centers in Baltimore City to be at Frederick Douglass High School, to the extent practicable, or within a one-quarter mile radius of Mondawmin Metro Station if Frederick Douglass High School is not available.
Title
Baltimore City – 2020 General Election – Early Voting Centers
Sponsors
Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {974034/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB442 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Baltimore City
Elections
Emergency Bills
Local Government Mandates
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Voting
Elections
Emergency Bills
Local Government Mandates
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Schools
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 10 | 301.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |