MD SB314 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain provisions of law relating to confidentiality of juvenile records apply to all police records and court records concerning a child excluded from the jurisdiction of the juvenile court under a certain provision of law from the time of the child's arrest until a certain event occurs; establishing that, if a case is transferred to the juvenile court, certain provisions of law relating to confidentiality of juvenile records continue to apply and a certain criminal charge is subject to expungement; etc.
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confidentiality of Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-34) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 5:00 p.m. |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {808572/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Arrests
Correctional Institutions
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Expungement
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Privacy
Records
Warrants
Correctional Institutions
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Expungement
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Privacy
Records
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 4 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |