MD SB317 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the share of the intestate estate of a decedent inherited by a surviving spouse under certain circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates and Trusts – Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {648577/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-30SenateHearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback