MD SB317 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB702
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Senate Requests House Recede
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an Executive Branch agency to ban or regulate the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Frederick County; and providing an exception for a career exploration and development activity in a public high school in Frederick County that sold coffee on or before June 30, 2018.
Title
Frederick County - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (132-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {275262/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB317 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Senate Requests House Recede
HB309 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB309 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Continuing Education
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education - Miscellaneous
Food
Frederick County
Job Training
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Continuing Education
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education - Miscellaneous
Food
Frederick County
Job Training
Public Schools
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations