MD SB318 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the School Safety Subcabinet Advisory Board to include a representative of a nonpublic special education school by increasing from four to five the members of the public to be appointed by the Governor and including a representative of a nonpublic special education school.
Title
Education - School Safety Subcabinet Advisory Board - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions
Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Safety
Special Education
Committees and Commissions
Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Safety
Special Education