MD SB319 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a State or local law enforcement agency and State or local volunteer fire company, rescue squad, fire department, and ambulance service to place a move over safety monitoring system on, or integrate a move over safety monitoring system into, an emergency vehicle for the purpose of recording a motor vehicle committing a violation relating to the operation of a motor vehicle on approach of an emergency vehicle; providing a certain recorded image is admissible in a proceeding concerning a certain civil citation; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB130 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Subjects
Ambulances
Citations
District Courts
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Fire Protection
Forms
Judges
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Postal Service
Recordings
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Time
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Volunteers
Citations
District Courts
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Fire Protection
Forms
Judges
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Postal Service
Recordings
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Time
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 4 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 405.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |