MD SB322 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, by July 1, 2020, to develop a certain program of education on the dangers of gambling and gambling addiction to be provided in public high schools; requiring the program to be coordinated with other State agencies responsible for gambling addiction education; authorizing a county board of education, beginning in the 2021-2022 school year, to require each public high school in the county to include instruction on the dangers of gambling one time for students in grades 9 through 12; etc.
Title
Public High Schools – Health Education – Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-2) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {324730/1 Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB322 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Gaming
Health
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time
Age
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Gaming
Health
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time