MD SB326 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 273
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 273
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped to be the Maryland Library for the Blind and Print Disabled; and altering the appointed membership of the Maryland State Library Board to include a blind patron of the Maryland Library for the Blind and Print Disabled.
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 273 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB604 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272
Subjects
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Literacy
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education - Miscellaneous
Libraries
Literacy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 11 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 11 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |