MD SB327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General to bring certain actions on behalf of certain susceptible adults and older adults; authorizing the Securities Commissioner of the Division of Securities of the Office of the Attorney General to bring a civil action on behalf of certain susceptible adults and older adults; specifying that the Act does not apply to certain financial institutions; authorizing a susceptible or older adult to bring an action under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {662414/1 Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {288976/1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Attorney General
Attorneys
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Consumer Protection
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Elderly Persons
Fraud
Parents and Guardians
Power of Attorney
Securities
Spouses
Statutes of Limitation
Theft
Vulnerable Adults
Attorneys
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Consumer Protection
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Elderly Persons
Fraud
Parents and Guardians
Power of Attorney
Securities
Spouses
Statutes of Limitation
Theft
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 11 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 13 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |