MD SB330 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility be installed in certain public restrooms in certain public buildings; requiring the Board of Public Works, through the Department of General Services, to adopt certain standards; providing that the Department of General Services, the University System of Maryland, and the Department of Transportation are responsible for the enforcement of certain provisions of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-17) (Y: 117 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-14) (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 523
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (117-17)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseDelegates Hill, Charles, and Chisholm
2019-04-06HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-06HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenators Waldstreicher, Hester, and Washington
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (124-14)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {666282/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-21HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {488672/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13SenateLaid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {488672/1
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-30SenateHearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0330&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0330f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0330t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0330e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_523_sb0330e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0330_48867201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0330_66628201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0330_97332801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0330_89372101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0330.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0330_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0614.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0330_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0330_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1192.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0330_89372101.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1569.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1400.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback