MD SB334 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain appointing authority, on request, to provide a list of the names of the candidates to fill a vacancy of an elected member of a county board of education to the individual who made the request or by publication on the website of the appointing authority; and defining "appointing authority" as the individual or entity that is responsible for appointing a qualified individual to fill a vacancy of an elected member of a county board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boards of Education - Appointment to Fill a Vacancy of an Elected Member - Candidate Information Requests

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 496
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {454132/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback