MD SB335 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the Somerset County Liquor Control Board reserve fund from up to $150,000 to up to $300,000; and increasing the maximum amount of money from $50,000 to $100,000, the Liquor Control Board may distribute from the reserve fund to a dispensary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback