MD SB336 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a County Commissioner from a commissioners' district to reside in that commissioners' district for the 6 months immediately preceding the filing deadline for the election of the Commissioner and during the full term of office of the Commissioner; prohibiting a Commissioner from a commissioners' district from continuing the current term if the Commissioner does not maintain residency in that commissioners' district under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194
2019-04-03SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-03SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments {130216/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {914537/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-31SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0336&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0336f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0336t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0336e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_194_sb0336e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0336_91453701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0336_13021601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0336.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0336_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0330.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0336_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1049.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1080.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback