MD SB338 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB532
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the distribution of proceeds from video lottery terminals at a facility in Allegany County after 10 years of operations at the facility.
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {849936/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB338 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Ways and Means
HB435 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
HB435 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 1A-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1A-26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1A-27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |