MD SB338 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB128
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an animal control facility operated by a county or municipality to waive the adoption fee for a dog or cat for a veteran who presents a valid driver's license or identification card that includes a notation of veteran status; authorizing an animal control facility to limit the number of adoption fee waivers granted to an individual under the Act to one dog and one cat within a 6-month period; and applying the Act to all counties and municipalities.
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 2:30 p.m. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB128 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB563 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
HB563 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Animal Shelters
Counties
Fees
Identification
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Veterans
Animal Shelters
Counties
Fees
Identification
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |