MD SB339 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-13)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Emergency Number Systems Board to establish certain minimum standards for records retention guidelines for 9-1-1 audio, video, text messages, and data; requiring the Board to establish minimum standards for certain 9-1-1 systems that ensure access for individuals with disabilities; altering the purposes of the 9-1-1 Trust Fund beginning on January 1, 2020; authorizing the use of money collected from a certain 9-1-1 fee to pay costs associated with maintenance, operations, and programs approved by the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-6) (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-6) (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302
2019-03-27SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (40-6)
2019-03-27SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0)
2019-03-25HouseFloor Committee Amendment {836288/1 Adopted
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-06SenateThird Reading Passed (40-6)
2019-03-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-04SenateFloor Amendment {843125/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {717674/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-01SenateLaid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-03-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {717674/1
2019-03-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0339&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0339f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0339t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0339e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_302_sb0339e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0339_71767401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0339_84312501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0339_83628801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0339.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0339_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0383.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0339_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0911.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0802.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback