MD SB34 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Tourist Area and Corridor Program in the State Highway Administration to develop a system of supplemental guide signs that direct motorists to eligible attractions within a geographical area; requiring the Administration to adopt certain regulations; providing that certain individual attractions are eligible for a sign; establishing the Task Force on Attraction Signs to review and report its findings regarding program consolidation, streamlining certain processes, and potential funding by October 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Tourist Area and Corridor Program and Task Force on Attraction Signs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Highways
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Sunset
Tourism
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Highways
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
State Highway Administration
Sunset
Tourism
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways