MD SB340 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing certain requirements technology-based businesses must meet before the Maryland Technology Development Corporation may make a certain grant or provide certain equity investment financing; requiring the Corporation to adopt certain regulations related to the investment committee; requiring the Board of Directors of the Corporation to make certain appointments; providing that certain persons are subject to the Public Ethics Law; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investments and Operations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {765367/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-04-01HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-29HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-03-29HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {707076/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0340&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0340f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0340t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0340e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_488_sb0340e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0340_70707601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0340_76536701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/sb0340.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0340_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0836.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0340_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1367.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1343.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback